Financial history OUGHTRINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £103.92k £132.39k £101.55k £103.51k £116.00k
Total expenditure £96.88k £114.68k £113.60k £104.79k £123.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £84.81k
Income from government grants £75.39k £91.81k £68.28k £75.07k N/A