KEMBLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kemble Village Hall Management Committee manage the hall with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants of the Parish. It is our aim to maintain the building and improve the facilities available for the community, financed by hire charges and various fund raising activities. The hall is mainly used by local social and recreational groups with some private functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 June 1994: Standard registration
- KEMBLE VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Demain Chairman | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Robson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzi Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Christopher Binks | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.98k | £13.79k | £3.50k | £11.91k | £9.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £5.11k | £6.84k | £6.44k | £5.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.48k | N/A | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KEMBLE IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER (HEREINAFTER CALLED "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PARISH OF KEMBLE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemble Village Hall
School Road
Kemble
Cirencester
Gloucestershire
GL7 6AG
- Phone:
- 07939526373
- Email:
- demain@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window