Accounts and annual returns BURTON-ON-THE-WOLDS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1038703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 June 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 June 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window