Financial history BURTON-ON-THE-WOLDS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1038703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.36k £92.02k £110.87k £71.97k £77.84k
Total expenditure £54.79k £83.06k £95.04k £58.65k £100.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £49.62k £39.49k
Income from government grants £43.84k £59.17k £76.57k N/A N/A