THORNBOROUGH AND THORNTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The WI plays an important role in the life of the local community. The speakers at the monthly meetings cover a wide range of subjects: travel, healthcare, cooking, arts,crafts and history. Outings are arranged to places of interest. We also cater at many village events. We take a great interest in current affairs and have mounted national campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 16 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethan Telford | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Julier | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynne Grayson | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN BURY | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERESA CONNOLLY | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA KING | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NORA BROCK | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VEDA MURPHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £560 | £1.33k | £1.57k | £3.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £681 | £910 | £1.55k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THORNBOROUGH AND THORNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Church Lane Cottages
Church Lane
Thornborough
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 2DG
- Phone:
- 07305009991
- Email:
- hq@bucksfwi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window