SWINDON IA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support and advice for ostomists and their families by way of meetings, specialist magazines (both national and regional), local newsletters and our own website. Work with our local health professionals to help them to help us.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK WILLIAMS | Chair | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Lancaster | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert George | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL SEED | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Fernandes | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.94k | £929 | £9.56k | £1.20k | £4.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.56k | £542 | £1.02k | £1.40k | £4.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 1994 AND AMENDED 17 NOVEMBER 1996 as amended on 05 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO HELP ANYONE LIVING IN THE SWINDON AREA AND ELSEWHERE WHOSE COLON HAS BEEN,OR IS ABOUT TO BE,REMOVED BY SURGICAL PROCEDURE OR WHO HAS AN OSTOMY; B) TO PROMOTE AND CO-ORDINATE RESEARCH INTO BOWEL DISEASE AND OTHER CONDITIONS LEADING TO THE REMOVAL OF THE COLON,SURGICAL PROCEDURES PERTAINING THERETO,AND RELATED MATTERS AND FURTHER TO PROMOTE THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE GAINED BY SUCH RESEARCH; C) TO KEEP OSTOMISTS AND OTHERS INFORMED OF ALL MATTERS OF INTEREST TO THE ASSOCIATION BY THE PERIODIC DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION BY ARRANGING CONFERENCES,SEMINARS AND COURSES ON TOPICS OF INTEREST,AND IN ANY OTHER MANNER WHICH IS CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
IN THE SWINDON AREA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Kenwin Close
SWINDON
SN3 4NY
- Phone:
- 07973307726
- Email:
- secretary@swindon-ia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window