MADINA MOSQUE HORSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and distress to Muslims in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 June 1994: Standard registration
- MADINA MOSEQUE HORSHAM (Previous name)
- MOHAMMEDIYA MOSEQUE HORSHAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saeed Mohammad | Chair | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ZESHAN MOHAMMAD | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAMRAN MOHAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.89k | £23.94k | £23.17k | £48.15k | £34.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.22k | £32.46k | £23.61k | £35.17k | £36.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.84k | £1.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 30 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN HORSHAM 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY,HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST MUSLIMS IN THE UK
Area of benefit
HORSHAM,WEST SUSSEX AND UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PARK TERRACE EAST
HORSHAM
RH13 5DN
- Phone:
- 07969579605
- Email:
- MANGOMILK78@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window