Financial history FRIENDS OF HATTON PARK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.17k £3.63k £10.94k £19.50k £14.67k
Total expenditure £22.13k £4.70k £10.61k £21.52k £19.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A