Financial history ENERGY ACTION DEVON

Charity Number: 1038765
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £469.75k £1.25m £1.05m £772.02k £1.31m
Total expenditure £468.98k £1.08m £858.27k £774.58k £926.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.25m £1.04m £762.29k £1.30m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.20k £4.46k £9.02k £1.36k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £700 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.07m £853.57k £768.08k £917.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.90k £4.70k £5.87k £4.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £637 £4.74k