Financial history COLBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1038784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.16k £10.59k £10.57k £5.28k £7.02k
Total expenditure £6.49k £1.92k £10.15k £8.48k £6.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £9.67k N/A N/A