Financial history CHARITABLE TRUST OF ROTARY INTERNATIONAL DISTRICT 1130 (GREATER LONDON)

Charity number: 1038790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.15k £1.10k £20.06k £10.04k £5.49k
Total expenditure £1.10k £634 £9.10k £7.68k £5.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A