TUNBRIDGE WELLS ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Festival is to advance the education of the public in the Arts, in particular the Arts of Music, Speech and Drama. The Festival promotes its object by holding annual competitions and a subsequent concert to promote items of merit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 21 June 1994: Standard registration
- ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS COMPETITIVE ARTS FESTVAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Barstow | Chair | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ROSS | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £58 | £4.05k | £7.42k | £8.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.85k | £332 | £4.92k | £4.99k | £8.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1994 as amended on 15 Sept 2024 as amended on 15 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
The object of the Festival shall be to advance the education of the public in the Arts, in particular the Arts of music, speech and drama in all their branches.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KENT, EAST SUSSEX AND S.E. LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BYWAYS
SEAL DRIVE
SEAL
SEVENOAKS
TN15 0AH
- Phone:
- 07792575678
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window