Frontline AIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frontline AIDS is the new name of the International HIV/AIDS Alliance. The charity is the UK-based secretariat of a global partnership of national organisations working to support community action on HIV and AIDS. National partners and local community groups are supported by technical expertise, policy work and fundraising carried out at the secretariat and across the global partnership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£13,786,239
Donations and legacies | £16.74k | |
Charitable activities | £13.50m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £270.17k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,608,909
Raising funds | £446.81k | |
Charitable activities | £14.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £446.81k | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.16m |
People

77 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- China
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Peru
- Senegal
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 July 1994: Standard registration
- Frontline Global (Working name)
- FRONTLINE AIDS (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL HIV/AIDS ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- THE ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abby Maxman | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Purnima Mane | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Micheal Osabohien Ighodaro | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joan Wanjiru Nyanyuki | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nana Poku | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Maria Hayes | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Maya Mungra | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.84m | £18.88m | £15.19m | £13.28m | £13.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.79m | £18.59m | £15.14m | £14.15m | £14.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £169.20k | £329.52k | £1.75m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £16.45k | £8.57k | £4.26k | £52.12k | £16.74k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.63m | £18.81m | £15.19m | £13.18m | £13.50m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £188.78k | £63.10k | £4.20k | £41.25k | £270.17k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.79m | £18.59m | £14.23m | £14.03m | £14.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £909.94k | £120.44k | £446.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £237.35k | £342.76k | £191.75k | £4.23k | £2.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £9.62m | £9.79m | £6.73m | £6.33m | £6.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.93k | £8.79k | £4.49k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £15.28m | £11.00m | £13.76m | £13.33m | £11.67m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £9.64m | £5.25m | £7.88m | £7.79m | £6.99m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 1994 AND 25 APRIL 2008 as amended on 23 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO HIV AND TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH B. THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES BY CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS ADVANCING HEALTH, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO HIV AND SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH C. THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) PARTICULARLY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS D. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED AMONG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV, INCLUDING THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, IN ADDITION TO ENSURING THAT THEY ARE HEALTHY E. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brighton Junction 1A Isetta Square
35 New England Street
BN1 4GQ
- Phone:
- 01273718900
- Email:
- mail@frontlineaids.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window