Financial history PTFA OF MINSTER SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.41k £2.32k £5.80k £13.66k £9.24k
Total expenditure £22.74k £2.78k £5.16k £12.10k £6.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A