CROSS ASH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fundraise for Cross Ash Primary School in order to provide equipment and services either not provided by the LEA or outside the scope of the LEA's provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £11,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 30 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Glyn-Jones | Chair | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Wiltshire | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Chadwick | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Morgan | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Reece | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.29k | £5.73k | £23.87k | £27.14k | £24.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.89k | £3.25k | £17.54k | £34.82k | £8.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.69k | £11.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross Ash Primary School
Cross Ash
Abergavenny
NP7 8PL
- Phone:
- 01873821427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window