TORRIDGE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Learning. Sport , leisure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 22 June 1994: Standard registration
- TORRIDGE THIRD AGE GROUP ( NORTH DEVON ) (Previous name)
- TORRIDGE U3A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Thompson | Chair | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Pavitt | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robilliard | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dianne Thompson | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Wendy Roden | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Williams | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Thompson | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Summerhayes | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison June Tamplin | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN KELLY | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.94k | £4.21k | £8.74k | £12.27k | £17.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.86k | £5.84k | £11.78k | £11.83k | £13.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2012 as amended on 14 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN BIDEFORD (NORTH DEVON) AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (2)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
TORRIDGE DISTRICT OF NORTH DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Old Rectory Close
Instow
BIDEFORD
Devon
EX39 4LY
- Phone:
- 01271860374
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window