MACCLESFIELD FESTIVAL FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS
Charity number: 1038941
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
Registration history:
- 27 June 1994: Standard registration
- 18 February 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- MACCLESFIELD MUSIC FESTIVAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 12 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA, AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window