Financial history THE INTERNATIONAL SOMALI COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1038950
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £63.23k £23.93k £11.40k £18.87k £6.61k
Total expenditure £63.50k £22.40k £11.00k £18.34k £6.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A