NEW ADDINGTON WOMENS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe meeting place for women and children in New Addington community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
Governance
- 30 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE JUSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE LEWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STELLA WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBBIE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
I)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NEW ADDINGTON AREA IN THE BOROUGH OF CROYDON BOUNDED BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY TO THE EAST AND TANDRIDGE TO THE SOUTH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE SEX RACE POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF NEW ADDINGTON II)TO MAINTAIN MANAGE AND DEVELOP THE WOMENS CENTRE AT LA OVERBURY CRESCENT NEW ADDINGTON III)TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE WOMENS CENTRE AS ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NEW ADDINGTON CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Overbury Crescent
New Addington
CROYDON
CR0 0LR
- Phone:
- 01689841789
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window