HUNDON HEDGEHOGS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1038958
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PRE-SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £45,808
Total expenditure: £50,624

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1994: Standard registration
  • 05 April 2016: Funds received from 1023517 THURLOW BRADLEY AND DISTRICT PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HUNDON PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • HUNDON TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KELLY MEPHAM Chair 15 September 2015
None on record
Emma Morey Trustee 04 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £43.63k £35.99k £59.82k £32.47k £45.81k
Total expenditure £39.71k £33.57k £40.38k £43.21k £50.62k
Income from government contracts N/A £34.70k £48.05k £30.16k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.73k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 September 2024 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 September 2024 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2023 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 May 2023 330 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 February 2022 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hundon Village Hall
North Street
Hundon
CO10 8EE
Phone:
01440786638
Website:

No information available