Accounts and annual returns WRINGTON VALE MEDICAL PRACTICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1038961
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2015 22 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2014 27 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2013 13 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2012 18 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Not Required