Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF ALEXANDRA JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £15.95k £13.89k £2.43k £13.20k £20.25k
Total expenditure £8.46k £14.09k £4.77k £7.83k £19.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A