Financial history THE MEANWOOD INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1039022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.72k £11.29k £3.73k £10.50k £12.02k
Total expenditure £7.65k £5.85k £5.77k £9.56k £9.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A