MEDICAL EMERGENCY DOCTOR SERVICE (WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Immediate Medical Care to the people of South Wales, by providing volunteer highly trained doctors to be on 24hr call to the Welsh Ambulance Services NHS Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 27 June 1994: Standard registration
- MEDSERVE WALES (Working name)
- MID GLAMORGAN EMERGENCY DOCTOR SERVICE (Previous name)
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Church | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||
Carl Powell | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||
John Solosy | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||
Dr IAN BOWLER | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||
Sian Guest | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.69k | £26.30k | £16.52k | £34.76k | £50.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.43k | £17.78k | £23.09k | £29.99k | £37.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF IMMEDIATE MEDICAL TREATMENT TO ANY PERSON IN NEED (2) TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE FIRE BRIGADE, THE POLICE, AMBULANCE SERVICES STATUTORY OR OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MID GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Cae Garw Bach
St. Fagans
Cardiff
Cardiff
Cardiff
CF5 6HH
- Phone:
- 07814 362428
- Email:
- chairman@medserve.wales
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window