KIRKLEATHAM HALL SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 1039051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Special Needs School for 192 full time pupils, plus a nursery with 13 part time pupils, with severe and profound learning difficulties and disabilities. Catchment area of Redcar/Marske/Dormanstown/Grangetown/Eston/South Bank/Normanby in the Borough of Redcar & Cleveland.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,266
Total expenditure: £55

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Redcar And Cleveland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul McLean Trustee 10 November 2015
FEDERATION OF LEADERS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION
Received: On time
Paul Gribbon Trustee 10 November 2015
None on record
Steven Harrison Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.77k £752 £4.16k £766 £1.27k
Total expenditure £1.10k £0 £4.73k £562 £55
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KIRKLEATHAM HALL SCHOOL
KIRKLEATHAM
REDCAR
TS10 4QR
Phone:
01642483009
Website:

kirkleathamhallschool.org.uk