WHITSTONE CP SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1039075
Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Various fundraising activities to raise extra funds for Whitstone Community Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021

Total income: £1,360
Total expenditure: £1,755

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerrie Burt Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £686 £1.42k £3.08k £1.26k £1.36k
Total expenditure £1.54k £818 £1.15k £1.58k £1.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
West Balsdon
Whistone
HOLSWORTHY
HOLSWORTHY
Devon
EX22 6LE
Phone:
01288341242
Website:

No information available