THE PICKWORTH WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an independant social meeting place for all age groups of Pickworth. User group activities/clubs include: IT/Computing, History, Gardening, Bingo, Informal & Formal Presentations/Talks, Keep fit, Yoga, Coffee mornings, Pantomine, Drama, Parties, Craft Fair, Bring & Buy, Private Functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 June 1994: Standard registration
- PICKWORTH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Selwyn Roberts | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy Paul Morley | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Dianne Dixon McPhail | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Brian Fuller | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Anthony Barratt | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jody Barratt | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM COUNSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88k | £10.29k | £2.38k | £1.62k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £3.09k | £2.52k | £4.34k | £2.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 9 MAY 1994 as amended on 12 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF PICKWORTH IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PICKWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
TURNING POINT HOUSE
VILLAGE STREET
PICKWORTH
SLEAFORD
NG34 0TD
- Phone:
- 01529497832
- Email:
- i.roberts6@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window