Financial history GARNDIFFAITH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £84.72k £67.96k £59.26k £85.47k £93.17k
Total expenditure £42.83k £61.51k £67.54k £96.84k £103.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.89k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.00k £45.00k £9.53k £6.00k N/A