DYSLEXIA TRUST

Charity Number: 1039105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Dyslexia Trust was established in 1994, to award bursaries to dyslexics who need help at Bristol Dyslexia Centre but are unable to attend for reasons of financial difficulty. The centre and trust aims to support people in the areas of Bristol, Gloucestershire and Somerset.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,983
Total expenditure: £5,615

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Gloucestershire
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BRISTOL DYSLEXIA TRUST (Working name)
  • THE BRISTOL DYSLEXIA TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACEY MARY Diani Chair 01 April 2019
None on record
Catherine Edwards Trustee 15 November 2024
None on record
SALLY PHIPPS Trustee 10 April 2000
None on record
PETER GODFREY Jones Trustee 20 June 1994
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.91k £55.25k £1.95k £1.22k £1.98k
Total expenditure £5.95k £32.85k £8.66k £9.18k £5.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Upper Belgrave Road
Bristol
BS8 2XH
Phone:
01179739405