Financial history CLAYDEN CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1039135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £539 £485 £1.06k £648 £989
Total expenditure £1.79k £475 £465 £465 £358
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A