10TH ROYAL ELTHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide scouting activities on a weekly basis during termtime including camping, craft activities, educational visits, outdoor challenges and indoor activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 01 July 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEX BIENKOV | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lyons | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise O'Malley | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Pinto | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Bienkov | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vince Bryan | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Stevens | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sudatta Bodhinayake | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Naiken | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Hopkins | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Thomas Hall | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Dumville | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Leslie Orton | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £22.88k | £27.56k | £18.35k | £29.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.47k | £14.30k | £9.86k | £23.68k | £25.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Nelson Mandela Way
London
SE3 9QS
- Phone:
- 02083192008
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window