Financial history CENTRE FOR THE CHILD TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1039237
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £175 £225 £4.04k £16 £699
Total expenditure £1.17k £1.14k £902 £443 £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A