CENTRE FOR THE CHILD TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for the Child Trust Fund was set up for a) the advancement of the education of children; and b) the advancement of the education of parents and carers in the care, education and bringing up of children through services and activities in the Centre for the Child in Birmingham Central Library
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 July 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL, TRUST AND CHARITIES SUB COMMITTEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175 | £225 | £4.04k | £16 | £699 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | £1.14k | £902 | £443 | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS AND CARERS IN THE CARE, EDUCATION AND BRINGING UP OF CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE BIRMINGHAM (INCLUDING SUTTON COLDFI
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL
Library of Birmingham
4 Centenary Square
BIRMINGHAM
B1 2ND
- Phone:
- 01213036140
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window