Financial history MERSEYSIDE IA

Charity number: 1039259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.54k £1.41k £1.22k £1.10k £1.06k
Total expenditure £1.83k £976 £1.36k £2.62k £1.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A