HOLY ANGELS SCHOOL, KIRKBY PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1039269
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SUPPORTS PUPILS ACTIVITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007

Total income: £843
Total expenditure: £1,029

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1994: Standard registration
  • 02 October 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2004 31/07/2007
Total gross income £2.10k £843
Total expenditure £2.14k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 09 December 2008 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2004 23 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 Not Required