Financial history CATHEDRALS PLUS

Charity number: 1039279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.10k £5.71k £556 £7.51k £20.85k
Total expenditure £28.84k £4.96k £1.78k £6.34k £22.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A