Financial history CHARITY COMPRISING PROCEEDS OF SALE OF MANCHESTER GERMAN PROTESTANT CHURCH

Charity number: 1039283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £3.50k £2.00k £4.00k £4.03k
Total expenditure £5.00k £0 £0 £9.50k £9.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A