FREEDOM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freedom Trusts objectives are delivered through Freedom Church, Freedom Community Alliance, FAM, Its vision is to promote the advancement of God's kingdom and to demonstrate God's heart and love by setting people free from the negative effects of life controlling problems. Our desire is to help people find and fulfil their purpose in life by providing written, audio and video material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 11 July 1994: Standard registration
- 13 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1125960 FREEDOM COMMUNITY ALLIANCE LIMITED
- AMIGOS INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- FREEDOM CENTRE PROJECTS (Working name)
- FREEDOM FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- PREPARED2PROGRESS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.53k | £81.34k | £28.49k | £20.57k | £9.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.72k | £70.45k | £55.60k | £15.57k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, 2. RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK, 3. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window