THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ABERDARE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising by holding Coffee Mornings,Organising Charity Concerts,Quiz, Making and selling Greetings Cards, Collecting items to complete boxes for Save the Children, Community Raffle
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 11 July 1994: Standard registration
- INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ABERDARE BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Lucas | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN EDWARDS President | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.12k | £2.70k | £3.84k | £2.65k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.39k | £2.29k | £3.77k | £1.00k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2025 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 May 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVACNEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 PINECROFT AVENUE
ABERDARE
CF44 0HY
- Phone:
- 01685874782
- Email:
- BrianWilliams@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window