HHH CONCERTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of high quality chamber music concerts performed by professional artists and available to all members of the public. Some concerts have an educational start or are designed for the elderly or people with learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 July 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Dennison | Chair | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Johnston | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kim Allison Bergamasco | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Betts | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Harry Barratt Smith | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Washer | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BURNETT | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.25k | £1.39k | £20.32k | £22.58k | £35.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.67k | £2.52k | £16.57k | £22.19k | £26.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SURREY HAMPSHIRE AND WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Meadows
Crondall Road
Crookham Village
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 5SU
- Phone:
- 07779 638698
- Email:
- Stephendennison1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window