Trustees HHH CONCERTS
Charity number: 1039309

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Dennison | Chair | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Johnston | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kim Allison Bergamasco | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Betts | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Harry Barratt Smith | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Washer | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BURNETT | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.