RUNNYMEDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1039314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A unit of the Scout Association providing suppport to Scout Groups, Explorer Scout Units and a Network Scout Unit in the Borough of Runnymede

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £71,763
Total expenditure: £86,810

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Fozard Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Tone Harie Fretheim Kelly Trustee 22 June 2021
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Andrew John Selwyn Trustee 22 June 2021
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Dr Penelope Ann Lympany Trustee 29 September 2020
1ST/4TH ADDLESTONE (ST PAUL'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
David Peter Breakwell Trustee 01 October 2016
2ND NEW HAW SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
David Moore Trustee 04 July 2011
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
1ST CHERTSEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
GEORGE BERTRAM KERR Trustee
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
David Thomas Kelly Trustee
2ND THORPE SCOUT GROUP
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.07k £18.20k £35.03k £66.68k £71.76k
Total expenditure £93.88k £11.38k £32.44k £58.99k £86.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £1.92k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Chesham Court
Brighton Road
SURBITON
Surrey
KT6 5PS
Phone:
01932564773