BISHOPSTOKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS. 2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 July 1994: Standard registration
- BCA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN PLOWMAN | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WINSTANLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.33k | £18.91k | £15.69k | £15.53k | £14.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.33k | £25.73k | £18.38k | £18.88k | £22.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1652 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS. 2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 16
Meller House
Oakbank Road
Bishopstoke
EASTLEIGH
SO50 6HF
- Phone:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window