THE SWANSEA UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity encourages older people of all backgrounds no longer in full-time employment to engage in educational/cultural activities. They are helped to use their skills to teach and learn on an affordable basis within a wide selection of groups. The U3A seeks to demonstrate their continuing contributions to the community as a whole and to project a positive image of their place in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 11 July 1994: Standard registration
- SWANSEA U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH HELEN MARTIN | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUZAN PAULINE SHEPHERD | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SHELDON | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARWEL WYN DAVIES | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
AILSA GARNER | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MILLER | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JOY POWER | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FAIRFAX BEALE | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hagain | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAM LEWIS | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN CROWLEY | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.79k | £12.00k | £17.15k | £15.87k | £16.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.66k | £10.00k | £13.86k | £20.91k | £25.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 16 FEBRUARY 1994, 25 JUNE 2003, 28 JUNE 2006, AND 27 JUNE 2007. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SWANSEA AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 Pennard Drive
Southgate
SWANSEA
SA3 2DW
- Phone:
- 01792233323
- Email:
- u3aswansea@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window