SHARON SPRATT AND CAROLINE THOMAS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
helping cancer victims
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 July 1994: Standard registration
- SHARONS TRUST (Working name)
- THE SHARON SPRATT TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER TEMPLAR NEEDHAM SPRATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN JAMES LIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.88k | £9.45k | £5.79k | £4.98k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.51k | £3.62k | £8.15k | £7.65k | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 November 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2012
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CANCER.2.THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR SUCH PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS.3.THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL DISTRESS OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PATIENTS OR OF DECEASED PATIENTS. 4.THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER.5.THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OR FUNDS WITH OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 TORTON HILL ROAD
ARUNDEL
BN18 9HL
- Phone:
- 07768 384088
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window