Trustees DANIEL OWEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Phillipson Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Joanne Edwards Trustee 07 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Taylor Trustee 06 July 2022
None on record
Teresa Mary Carberry Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
John Richard Scott Trustee 04 September 2020
None on record
Stephanie Scott Trustee 13 February 2018
None on record
TREFOR JONES Trustee 29 September 2011
None on record
ANN STREET Trustee
None on record