Financial history BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL (TOTON)

Charity number: 1039423
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £38.56k £49.62k £37.52k £33.14k £21.21k
Total expenditure £40.38k £44.19k £40.10k £34.74k £21.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.59k