ALDERSHOT AND FARNBOROUGH FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCING, PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE, SPEECH, LITERATURE AND ACTING, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE ORGANISATION OF FESTIVALS IN ALDERSHOT AND FARNBOROUGH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 July 1994: Standard registration
- ALDERSHOT AND FARNBOROUGH FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND ART FESTIVALS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Ruskell | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gillis | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Best | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Richmond | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SENTA RENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDY HAWKETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIA RUSKELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY JEAN ORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.61k | £386 | £427 | £11.12k | £20.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.58k | £1.25k | £1.04k | £9.32k | £15.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1994AS AMENDED 1ST NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH, DRAMA AND DANCE, IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
254 Mytchett Road
Mytchett
Camberley
GU16 6AF
- Phone:
- 07802314555
- Email:
- nicky@grahambest.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window