Financial history OPERATION NEW WORLD LIMITED

Charity number: 1039451
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £55.53k £86.53k £49.85k £92.55k £34.32k
Total expenditure £60.00k £62.32k £59.04k £62.22k £66.25k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A