Financial history HMS GANGES ASSOCIATION MUSEUM

Charity number: 1039452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.75k £13.13k £13.07k £13.00k £21.52k
Total expenditure £11.13k £9.33k £6.75k £10.23k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.70k £8.00k N/A £600